THE JEMPSONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1133142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.74k £1.82k £7.60k £12.66k £39.84k
Total expenditure £4.36k £2.66k £6.13k £9.45k £30.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A