Financial history NORTH WEST LEGAL SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1131259
Charity reporting is overdue by 1811 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £23.30k £20.22k £43.16k £23.32k £27.77k
Total expenditure £30.74k £18.04k £22.77k £43.46k £45.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0