Accounts and annual returns KING'S GATE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1130035
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 May 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 June 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 24 August 2021 146 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 17 May 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 17 May 2019 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 July 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 23 July 2018 114 days late Download Open in new window