Financial history ALL SAINTS COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1136158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £198.39k £173.63k £185.66k £226.19k £211.51k
Total expenditure £166.98k £197.78k £192.78k £166.81k £175.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.11k £25.03k £28.03k £44.50k £31.88k