LUCY AIR AMBULANCE FOR CHILDREN CHARITY

Charity number: 1138457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 November 2016 On time Download