LUCY AIR AMBULANCE FOR CHILDREN CHARITY

Charity number: 1138457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £570.54k £681.74k £418.10k £265.60k £321.06k
Total expenditure £329.77k £521.18k £534.18k £399.48k £323.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £472.85k £432.49k £94.67k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £567.19k £206.39k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £3.36k £475.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £99.24k £268.57k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £230.53k £252.61k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.60k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A