LUCY AIR AMBULANCE FOR CHILDREN CHARITY

Charity number: 1138457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Lukac Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Nicola Donnelly Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
WILLIAM ALEXANDER MASON TYLER Trustee 21 March 2017 None on record
Emma Louise Earl Trustee 19 July 2016 None on record
Patrick Adam Schoennagel Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Mathieu Julien Nicolas Proust Trustee 28 November 2019 None on record
Anna Louise Mitchell Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
Dean Robert Gillespie Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
James McCarthy Trustee 16 January 2019
MANE CHANCE SANCTUARY Received: On time