ST.PETER'S SCHOOL, YORK

Charity number: 1141329
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.37m £17.09m £17.59m £18.29m £17.58m
Total expenditure £14.96m £15.25m £16.02m £17.26m £17.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £618.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £153.53k £101.91k £97.82k £125.18k £197.92k
Income - Other trading activities £171.01k £206.05k £268.91k £272.53k £98.00k
Income - Charitable activities £15.94m £16.69m £17.12m £17.79m £17.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £72.52k £60.47k £71.41k £66.48k £57.10k
Income - Other £31.03k £32.74k £31.18k £33.36k £5.91k
Income - Legacies £52.65k £34.61k £29.95k £32.51k £28.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.69m £14.99m £15.71m £16.99m £16.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £274.46k £267.41k £311.43k £264.56k £283.97k
Expenditure - Governance £15.28k £15.72k £18.99k £19.99k £20.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.19k £11.26k £11.65k £11.64k £12.33k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0