Financial history THE ARTS SOCIETY SOUTH CAMBS

Charity number: 1132219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.57k £21.12k £15.31k £12.50k £12.59k
Total expenditure £14.24k £13.87k £13.26k £11.88k £9.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A