Financial history WREXHAM AFC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1130924
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £135.82k £139.60k £114.50k £127.92k £91.78k
Total expenditure £137.71k £132.10k £123.11k £109.27k £104.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £6.00k £360 £6.29k £1.30k