Accounts and annual returns ACTS 435

Charity number: 1131305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 03 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window