Trustees ACTS 435

Charity number: 1131305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Daniels Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Alison Mary Tsang Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Jonathan Paul Day Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
CANON PETER JOHN WARRY Trustee 31 July 2012
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND
Received: On time
UNIVERSITY OF YORK CHAPLAINCY CENTRE
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND
Received: On time
JULIAN RICHER Trustee 19 April 2011
ASB HELP
Received: On time
The Fairness Foundation
Received: On time