ZAHERA TRUST

Charity number: 1132956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 11 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 11 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download