PAN-ASIA COMMUNITY HOUSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide affordable housing and housing management services, primarily but not exclusively, for persons of South-East Asian origin living in the Midlands who are in conditions of need, poverty or distress, and To advance education and relieve financial hardship for such persons and to provide legal and other advice so as to advance them in life and assist them to adapt within a new community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elspeth Jane Bourne | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLIN TAMBLYN BOURNE | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Roy Luke | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MILLER-DEMIROVSKA | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|||||
John Masih | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.48k | £33.34k | £37.51k | £37.51k | £28.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.94k | £33.20k | £32.60k | £32.60k | £32.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 372 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 18 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND HOUSING MANAGEMENT SERVICES, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR PERSONS OF SOUTH EAST ASIAN ORIGIN LIVING IN THE MIDLANDS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, POVERTY OR DISTRESS ., AND 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONGST PERSONS OF SOUTH EAST ASIAN ORIGIN LIVING IN THE MIDLANDS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, POVERTY OR DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THE MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 PORTLAND ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B16 9QU
- Phone:
- 0121420392
- Email:
- colinbourne@pan-asia.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window