Accounts and annual returns THE HELIANTHUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1130451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 02 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 05 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 05 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 June 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 June 2021 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window