MASONIC HALL IPSWICH LTD

Charity number: 1130452
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £78.74k £80.22k £82.86k £85.60k £81.58k
Total expenditure £62.00k £63.78k £86.03k £58.39k £105.89k