ABSOLUTELY LEISURE

Charity number: 1131013
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.71m £4.50m £3.18m £4.35m £4.33m
Total expenditure £4.65m £4.38m £4.32m £4.71m £4.78m
Income from government contracts £0 £133.00k £58.17k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £353.43k £275.47k £244.83k £253.34k £325.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.35m £4.23m £3.68m £4.10m £4.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 -£740.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.65m £4.38m £4.32m £4.71m £4.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0