NAILSEA ENVIRONMENT AND WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Initially we will transform 6 acres of wetland and Alder carr into a nature reserve. We will fix fences, plant hedges and trees, survey for biodiversity and do pond dipping. We will excavate new ponds and remove invading scrub. We will acquire additional land to establish new nature reserves as opportunities arise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
Governance
- 04 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM SOUTHWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IAN ROBERT CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSEMARY DENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN WOODLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN IORWERTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.93k | £2.05k | £1.40k | £643 | £280 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £2.54k | £822 | £866 | £452 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 2008 as amended on 16 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 HEATH ROAD
NAILSEA
BRISTOL
BS48 1AG
- Phone:
- 01275 853079
- Email:
- hilarywest2016@gmail.com
- Website:
-
newt.nailsea@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window