DESMOND ANDERSON SPECIAL SUPPORT CENTRE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1130557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lousie Howe Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
DAVID MULDREW Trustee 07 March 2012 None on record
VICTORIA MULDREW Trustee 07 March 2012 None on record
NICHOLA ST GEORGE Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
Bob St George Trustee 07 February 2019 None on record
MARY RICHARDS Trustee 17 March 2013 None on record
Dorota Soronna Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
PAUL FLOWERDAY Chair
THE INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS' BURSARS ASSOCIATION Received: On time