THE NATIONAL INSTRUMENT COLLECTION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Following the departure of the chosen Administrator for los Angeles, the charity has been seeking another administrator and continuing to develop its knowledge of and connections with relevant organisations and individuals.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2016
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 22 Hydref 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Tachwedd 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2016 | 28 Mehefin 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2016 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JULY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
SUBJECT AS AFORESAID AND SUBJECT TO THE POWER OF ACCUMULATION CONTAINED IN CLAUSE HEREOF THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE TO OR TOWARDS THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE ACQUISITION PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COLLECTION OF GOOD QUALITY MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS BOOKS MANUSCRIPTS AND OTHER ARTICLES OF HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE TO MUSIC TO BE MADE AVAILABLE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES FOR PRACTICE PERFORMANCE STUDY AND TEACHING
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window