ETHICAL GIVING

Charity number: 1131343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download