Trustees COLLEGE OF CORPUS CHRISTI AND OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1137453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
49 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Christopher Kelly | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Christian Phillip Sorace | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Michael Pasco Fearon | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jan Stefan Tarnowski | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oleh Stupak | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nirupa Desai | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matilda Elizabeth Gillis | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samuel Warren Lasman | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Jane Fine | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eliza Harriet Haughton-Shaw | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rosemary Raine | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Caroline Ann Bassett | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amar Singh Sohal | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daria Frank | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Matthew James Bullimore | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rory Naismith | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Qingyuan Zhao | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Susanna Lane | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Mary Hoskin | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Kattuman | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Biggins | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Giulia Viggiani | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Sanger | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Ian David Abrahams | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fumiya Iida | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr John David Rhodes | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexis Joannides | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Paul Davison | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Milne | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ewan St John Smith | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN EDWARD MORGAN | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Professor Judy Hirst | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Hewett | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Howe | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Philip Bearcroft | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Emma Spary | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Pietro Cicuta | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor James Warren | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Barak Kushner | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor David Andrew Sneath | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Shruti Kapila | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Hugh Robinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Emma Wilson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr David Greaves | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Marina Frasca-Spada | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Simon Godsill | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor John Carr | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Keith Seffen | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Cain | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.