TRINITY HALL CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The College is an institution of higher education. Its purposes are the advancement of education, religion, learning and research. The College admits undergraduate and graduate students matriculated in the University of Cambridge. It provides financial and other support to those of its members who require it in order to achieve its purposes, and supports teaching and research in the University.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£18,928,000
Donations and legacies | £2.32m | |
Charitable activities | £7.15m | |
Other trading activities | £1.31m | |
Investments | £7.30m | |
Other | £856.00k |
Total expenditure:
£22,055,000
Raising funds | £5.87m | |
Charitable activities | £15.90m | |
Other | £292.00k |
£30,958,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.90m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.16m | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.90m | |
Retained for future use | £27.83m |
People

231 Employee(s)
66 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 August 2010: Standard registration
- COLLEGE OR HALL OF THE HOLY TRINITY (Working name)
- TRINITY HALL (Working name)
- TRINITY HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
66 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Mary Hockaday | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edward Philip Llewellyn Mair | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Campbell Alan McLachlan KC | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Demetra Kasimis | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sofia Karin Anna Lovestam | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vidya Margaret Venkatesh | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Lauren Dell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Milton Lawrence | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suf Tenzin Amichay | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniele Cassese | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Leonard Sutherland | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louis Robert Klee | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr James George Davies | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alena Drieschova | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marieke Meelen | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Keaton Balunas | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Grigalius Taujanskas | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr James David Gordon Wood | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachelle Stretch | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sourav Sarkar | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Archdale Dewar | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anton James Enright | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anya Erica Jane Burgon | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Harvey-Samuel | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Lee Howard De-Wit | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARCUS TOMALIN | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jaisingh Prabhakar Chitnavis | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Hatice Gunes | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rona Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Clement Tolley | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANE PARTNER | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronald Reid-Edwards | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Goncalo Lopes Bernardes | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Glen Sharp | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr HEATHER INWOOD | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor ADAM BRANCH | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ARTHUR | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr TAMSIN CHRISTINA O'CONNELL | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pedro Ramos Pinto | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Erdos | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor RAMJI VENKATARAMANAN | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor STEPHEN WATTERSON | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor ALEXANDER JOHN MARR | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JEROME JARRETT | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT ASHER | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVD DR STEPHEN JOHN PLANT | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor LOUISE HAYWOOD | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor ALEXANDRA TURCHYN | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF JAMES MONTGOMERY | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF SIMON MOORE | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leila Mukhida | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
DR ISABELLE MIRANDA MCNEILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor JAN-MELISSA SCHRAMM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF MICHAEL HOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF PETER JOHN CLARKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor ANDREW JAMES MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF FLORIAN HOLLFELDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NICK BAMPOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CRISTIANO ANDREA RISTUCCIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor EDMUND RICHARD STEPHAN KUNJI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF IAN BODEN WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor CLARE JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor GRAHAM PULLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF SIMON DAVID GUEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor JOHN BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF BRIAN CHEFFINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.03m | £13.23m | £27.98m | £24.21m | £18.40m | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.44m | £18.82m | £22.26m | £21.16m | £22.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £408.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.06m | £3.54m | £4.40m | £1.86m | £2.32m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.36m | £34.00k | £461.00k | £1.06m | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.90m | £4.78m | £6.15m | £6.52m | £7.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £78.00k | £1.57m | £963.00k | £235.00k | £525.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.17m | £5.73m | £6.16m | £8.49m | £7.30m | |
|
Income - Other | £610.00k | £726.00k | £11.78m | £6.52m | £856.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £1.36m | £1.78m | £71.50k | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.12m | £12.12m | £13.92m | £14.85m | £15.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.33m | £5.86m | £5.42m | £5.90m | £5.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.19m | £1.44m | £1.22m | £817.00k | £552.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £298.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £890.00k | £1.69m | £1.20m | £1.08m | £1.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £841.00k | £2.92m | £410.00k | £292.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £96.01m | £95.97m | £95.07m | £95.72m | £94.53m | |
|
Long-term investments | £289.88m | £335.27m | £318.59m | £352.51m | £380.53m | |
|
Other assets | £13.97m | £12.59m | £38.21m | £25.95m | £23.99m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£8.47m | -£7.40m | -£4.56m | -£3.78m | -£2.62m | |
|
Total liabilities | £78.41m | £78.55m | £79.35m | £81.54m | £79.57m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDED 1350 CONFIRMED BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT OF 1558 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION , RELIGION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY HALL
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1TJ
- Phone:
- 01223332500
- Email:
- info@trinhall.cam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window