THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALENE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £11.81m £18.32m £15.64m £18.70m £10.27m
Total expenditure £10.56m £10.74m £12.55m £10.31m £9.53m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.51m £8.45m £4.61m £8.87m £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities £1.31m £1.35m £1.31m £1.35m £60.39k
Income - Charitable activities £5.67m £5.86m £5.88m £4.98m £4.93m
Income - Endowments £526.18k £1.06m £252.14k £1.05m £290.38k
Income - Investment £2.62m £3.49m £3.86m £4.00m £3.53m
Income - Other £222.16k £239.03k £232.41k £542.36k £386.81k
Income - Legacies £504.08k £1.50m £216.01k £221.41k £192.54k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.64m £7.85m £8.80m £7.67m £7.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.04m £2.08m £2.17m £2.43m £1.02m
Expenditure - Governance £86.41k £83.85k £91.02k £87.77k £78.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £259.84k £252.88k £213.99k £198.54k £225.46k
Expenditure - Other £885.20k £799.51k £1.58m £203.45k £637.79k