Trustees THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALENE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

44 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Christopher Greenwood Chair 01 October 2020
DR JOHN MILLINGTON SCHOLARSHIP CHARITY
Overdue by 44 days
Dr Cecily Whiteley Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Professor Linda Fisher Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Klaus Okkenhaug Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Jessica Patterson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Eduardo Gallo Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Alastair Mills Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Simon Ravencroft Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Professor Paul Lane Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
SARAH C ATKINS Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
Professor JOHN J ORR Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Dr NICHOLAS ROGER CARROLL Trustee 20 July 2017
None on record
Professor STEPHEN JOHN EGLEN Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR SAUL DUBOW Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr SERGIO BACALLADO Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Rev JOHN MUNNS Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Dr Tijmen Euser Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
Dr ARI ERCOLE Trustee 13 March 2014
None on record
Dr Walid Khaled Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Professor LUKE SKINNER Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Professor SIMON STODDART Trustee 22 March 2012
MEDITERRANEAN ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
Professor EMILY SO Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
PROFESSOR AMIRA BENNISON Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Dr RICHARD ROEBUCK Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
CORINNE LLOYD Trustee 22 March 2012
None on record
Professor CECILIA BRASSETT Trustee
None on record
Professor CARL STUART WATKINS Trustee
None on record
Dr ALLEGRE LAURENCE HADIDA Trustee
None on record
Professor TIMOTHY ARTHUR COOMBS Trustee
None on record
Professor ANTJE LUISE DU BOIS-PEDAIN Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR HOLGER BABINSKY Trustee
None on record
Dr GARETH PETER PEARCE Trustee
None on record
DR JANE HUGHES Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR TIMOTHY NORMAN HARPER Trustee
None on record
Dr MARCUS WAITHE Trustee
None on record
Dr ROWAN MARGARET BURNSTEIN Trustee
None on record
STEVEN JOHN MORRIS Trustee
DR JOHN MILLINGTON SCHOLARSHIP CHARITY
Overdue by 44 days
Professor NEIL GARATH JONES Trustee
None on record
Dr JOHN ROBERT PATTERSON Trustee
None on record
Professor BRENDAN JOSEPH BURCHELL Trustee
None on record
Professor STUART MARTIN Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL DUPREE Trustee
None on record
DR HUGHES AZERAD Trustee
None on record
SILKE CHARLOTTE MENTCHEN Trustee
None on record