LEAZES HOMES LIMITED

Charity number: 1133627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.58m £4.29m £5.19m £6.29m £6.27m
Total expenditure £3.30m £3.73m £4.81m £6.01m £6.23m
Income from government contracts £10.60k £20.38k £17.30k £17.30k £17.82k
Income from government grants £0 £298.00k £1.91m £1.15m £50.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.56m £4.29m £5.19m £6.29m £6.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £3.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £12.00k £3.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.30m £3.73m £4.81m £6.01m £6.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £136.00k £142.00k £154.00k £153.21k £179.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0