Financial history ANGLIA IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1134478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.09k £29.60k £25.91k £3.10k £721
Total expenditure £20.34k £20.60k £19.98k £3.90k £848
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A