BLACKWATER VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1131981
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required