THE BRITISH AMBULANT DISABLED SPORTS AND ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
limbPower Games Winter Games Junior and Primary Games Kilimanjaro Challenge London to Paris Challenge Information and advice on engaging in sporting activities #I Can Family Camp #I Cab Teen Camp
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 November 2009: Standard registration
- LIMBPOWER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET WILLIAMS | Chair | 22 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Ken Black | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Chris Linnitt | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Morris | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Angela Caroline Schroeder | Trustee | 22 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ross Wadey | Trustee | 22 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Carl Barrett | Trustee | 31 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.17k | £225.14k | £216.56k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.55k | £174.00k | £208.29k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.73k | £53.50k | £26.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.17k | £75.24k | £79.41k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF AMBULANT DISABLED PEOPLE (INDIVIDUALS WITH IMPAIRMENTS TO THEIR LIMBS WHO ARE NOT WHEELCHAIR BOUND) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitecroft
Tandridge Lane
Lingfield
RH7 6LL
- Phone:
- 01342893486
- Email:
- kiera@limbpower.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window