LINDISFARNE COLLEGE OF THEOLOGY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Education for Discipleship (an opportunity to enable lay Christians to further develop their learning) * Training for Ministry * Continuing Ministerial and Professional Development for those accredited lay and ordained ministries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 June 2010: Standard registration
- LINDISFARNE REGIONAL TRAINING PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Dr Alan Bennett Bartlett | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Katherine Janet Bagnall | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Morgan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachel Wood | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY JONATHAN HEWITT | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Revd Susan McCormack | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.49k | £281.15k | £255.04k | £305.59k | £303.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.49k | £252.84k | £301.07k | £343.25k | £391.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION AND DELIVERY OF EDUCATION FOR THE DISCIPLESHIP, INITIAL MINISTERIAL EDUCATION AND CONTINUING MINISTERIAL DEVELOPMENT FOR BOTH ORDAINED AND LAY MEMBERS OF PARTICIPATING CHRISTIAN CHURCHES 2 THE PROVISION OF OTHER THEOLOGICAL AND MINISTERIAL TRAINING AND CHRISTIAN EDUCATION TO BOTH LAY AND ORDAINED PERSONS 3 ENGAGING AND COOPERATING WITH OTHERS IN SUCH THEOLOGICAL AND MINISTERIAL TRAINING AND CHRISTIAN EDUCATION; AND 4 THE PROMOTION AND RESEARCH INTO THEOLOGY AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lindisfarne College of Theology
Church House
St. Johns Terrace
NORTH SHIELDS
NE29 6HS
- Phone:
- 07768788283
- Email:
- enquiries@lindisfarnect.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window