UMOYA TRUST UK

Charity number: 1133234
Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 May 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 August 2021 109 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required