Financial history UMOYA TRUST UK

Charity number: 1133234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £309.68k £357.60k £322.72k £401.35k £271.18k
Total expenditure £249.88k £359.25k £369.05k £377.94k £272.69k
Income from government contracts £204.19k £128.19k £89.96k £98.73k £96.37k
Income from government grants £20.00k £46.93k £7.91k N/A N/A