20 STORIES HIGH

Charity number: 1137255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Manoka Mbolokele Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
Ngunan Maureen Adamu Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
Martha Abigail Hawkins Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
Dr Priyanka Pradhan Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
Kieron Gregory Collins Trustee 16 May 2018 None on record
Alice Demba Trustee 12 November 2014 None on record
Toyin Otubusin Trustee 30 November 2016 None on record
YVONNE HEPBURN-FOSTER Chair 03 February 2014 None on record
CURTIS WATT Trustee 12 June 2013 None on record
Charlie Taylor Trustee 16 May 2018 None on record