Trustees THE SOCIETY OF INTERNATIONAL ECONOMIC LAW
Charity number: 1133176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisa Baronini | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christos Tassis | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Henckels | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vera Helena Thorstensen | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Geraldo Vidigal Neto | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rodrigo Polanco Lazo | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Victor Augusto Saco Chung | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tetyana Payosova | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Todd Weiler | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tracey Epps | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Olabisi Delebayo Akinkugbe | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Yuka Fukunaga | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Fabio Costa Morosini | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Monique Andre Van Damme | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Ilaria Espa | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Johanna Maria Jacobsson | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Weihuan Zhou | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Leo Henri Van den Bossche | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria Jesus Pereyra Lopez | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria Laura Marceddu | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Li-Tian Hsieh | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Franziska Sucker | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARKUS WAGNER | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.