BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SUPPORTED EMPLOYMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of information, support and representation for providers of supported employment services. Provision of information and support for customers and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Green | Chair | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roshni Shrosbree | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maurice George | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Spurgeon | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shona Claydon | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neryssa Charman | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Edward Corless | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Seddon | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ramsay Taylor | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Petra Alexandra Kennedy | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Alistair Kerr | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Stenning | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Britt | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.10k | £211.51k | £132.75k | £159.16k | £325.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.24k | £107.72k | £150.33k | £218.73k | £153.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND OR OTHER ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR VOCATIONAL LIFE SKILLS AND IN PARTICULAR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS RELEVANT TO PARTICIPATION IN EMPLOYMENT. B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 15 Aldershot Enterprise Centre
14-40 Victoria Road
Louise Margaret Road
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU11 1TQ
- Phone:
- 01252 912829
- Email:
- admin@base-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window