AFRICAN CENTRE FOR MINING, ENVIRONMENT AND DEVELOPMENT (AFROMED)

Charity number: 1134909
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £10.50k £0 £1.79k £0 £0
Total expenditure £9.38k £226 £3.43k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A