Accounts and annual returns AL MADINA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1136277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 09 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required