WELWITSCHIA WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1131751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required