WELWITSCHIA WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1131751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.95k £15.38k £75.45k £70.71k £69.85k
Total expenditure £15.29k £18.18k £50.34k £61.04k £64.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A