Trustees CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1131655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Clayton Chair 01 April 2015
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Revd Richard John Moy Trustee 01 January 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, TURNHAM GREEN
Received: On time
THE GROUP-BASED OPEN LEARNING DISCIPLESHIP PROJECT
Received: On time
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Reverend Sarah Jayne Hewitt Trustee 01 January 2023
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Catherine Marianne Morgan Hickey Trustee 01 January 2023
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Chloe Sarah Louter Trustee 01 January 2022
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
SIMON CHRISTOPHER UPCOTT FCA BFP Trustee 25 June 2020
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
SONG AND HYMN WRITERS FOUNDATION CIO
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL CHINA CONCERN
Received: On time
ROYAL ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Fiona Lambert Trustee 01 January 2020
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Anne Keene Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Dr KEVIN ROBERT MCKEMEY Trustee 01 January 2018
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Mark Bowerman Trustee 01 January 2018
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
John Thoburn Stansfeld Trustee 01 January 2018
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Beauman Sing Tat Chong Trustee 01 January 2016
WINCHESTER BASICS BANK
Received: On time
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time