Financial history THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE FOR SECURITIES AND INVESTMENT

Charity number: 1132642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.42m £16.48m £16.22m £13.38m £17.03m
Total expenditure £14.40m £15.74m £15.72m £13.96m £17.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £14.96m £16.01m £15.75m £13.02m £15.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £121.05k £126.89k £199.56k £167.32k £144.55k
Income - Other £341.33k £349.97k £275.19k £194.68k £1.06m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.40m £15.74m £15.72m £13.96m £17.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £140.07k £50.39k £157.99k £131.78k £47.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0