Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE FOR SECURITIES AND INVESTMENT
Charity number: 1132642

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Cole-Fontayn | Chair | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Kottage Don Nandika Buddhipala | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Sidony McGuinnes | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Derek Moores | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Amyr Rocha Lima | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Charles Hughes-Penney | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Jane Elizabeth Orde Valls CSK | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Nicoll | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Clair Victoria Mills | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Petros Florides | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Tracey Ann Davidson | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Allen | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Debbie Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
DANIEL JOHN CORRIGAN | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
RAVIKUMAR HAYAGREEVA PURANAM | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Michelle Perryman | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Taylor | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN STUART RAMSAY | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.