VALUES ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131991
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2017 On time Download