Accounts and annual returns OXFORD TRANSPLANT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 May 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 May 2021 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 07 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 14 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window