Financial history OXFORD TRANSPLANT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £123.05k £240.01k £142.59k £123.97k £182.01k
Total expenditure £15.39k £27.81k £37.25k £33.49k £67.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A