Trustees OXFORD TRANSPLANT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR PETER JOHN FRIEND Chair 18 November 2019
None on record
Ana Catarina Gardete Trustee 28 September 2019
None on record
Rebecca Elizabeth Cullen Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Dr Phillip David Mason Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
Alison Joan Cornall Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Kazbi Zahir Soonawalla Trustee 15 June 2017
None on record
Professor Constantinos Cassios Coussios Trustee 08 June 2017
None on record