CARDINAL ALLEN TRUST

Charity number: 1139044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £8.80k £7.56k £2.00k £0 £4.93k
Total expenditure £240 £14.57k £1.40k £933 £6.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A