HECKINGTON AND DISTRICT BOWLS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the game of bowls in Heckington and District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Richard Dean CASSWELL | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Repp | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GEOFFREY COLLARD | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £20.48k | £5.18k | £7.52k | £8.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.38k | £15.87k | £4.69k | £8.45k | £6.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTH AND RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HECKINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS.
Area of benefit
HECKINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 St. Andrews Street
Heckington
SLEAFORD
Lincolnshire
NG34 9RE
- Phone:
- 01529461516
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window