AL-FOUZ TRUST

Charity number: 1133675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 April 2021 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 February 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 06 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required