AL-FOUZ TRUST

Charity number: 1133675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £63 £1.61k £330 £2.64k £0
Total expenditure £1.19k £6.44k £1.22k £12.56k £20.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A